blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2811007

EP2811007 - Alkylene oxide and hydrocarbyl-substituted polycarboxylic acid quaternised alkylamine as additives in fuels and lubricants and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.02.2015  [2015/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hansch, Markus
Mönchsgasse 10A
67346-Speyer / DE
02 / Böhnke, Harald
Seckenheimer Landstr. 117
68163- Mannheim / DE
03 / Grabarse, Wolfgang
Torwiesenstr. 21
68163- Mannhein / DE
04 / Völkel, Ludwig
Carl-Bosch-Str. 18
67117-Limburgerhof / DE
05 / Maxim, Peretolchin
Sommerbergstrasse 19
67446-Lambrecht / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstraße 4
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date13171057.607.06.2013
[2014/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811007
Date:10.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2013
ClassificationIPC:C10L1/222, C10L10/04
[2014/50]
CPC:
C10L1/222 (EP); C10L1/1883 (EP); C10L1/2225 (EP);
C10L2200/0423 (EP); C10L2200/043 (EP); C10L2200/0446 (EP);
C10L2270/023 (EP); C10L2270/026 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verwendung mit Alkylenoxid und Hydrocarbyl-substituierter Polycarbonsäure quaternisierter Alkylamine als Additive in Kraft- und Schmierstoffen[2014/50]
English:Alkylene oxide and hydrocarbyl-substituted polycarboxylic acid quaternised alkylamine as additives in fuels and lubricants and their use[2014/50]
French:Utilisation avec de l'oxyde d'alkylène et de l'acide polycarbonique à substitution hydrocarbyle d'alkylamines quaternisés comme additifs dans les carburants et lubrifiants[2014/50]
Examination procedure07.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/50]
20.01.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/09]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2012004300  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * example 1; claims 1,4,7,8,21,22 *;
 [AD]WO2006135881  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-22 * example 1; claims 1-3; table 5 *
by applicantUS4248719
 US4171959
 EP2033945
 WO2006135881
 EP1254889
 JPS6112197
 WO2010132259
 EP0244616
 WO9424231
 WO9703946
 DE19620262
 WO9603367
 WO9603479
 EP0476485
 EP0307815
 WO8701126
 EP0639632
 EP0310875
 EP0356725
 EP0700985
 US4877416
 DE3838918
 EP0831141
 DE3826608
 DE4142241
 DE4309074
 EP0452328
 EP0548617
 DE10102913
 WO9929748
 WO2005054314
 WO2004035715
 EP0061895
 US4491455
 WO9318115
 EP0261957
 WO0044857
 WO9804656
 US6743266
 WO0047698
 US3522179
 US4234435
 US4849572
 US4904401
 US5569644
 US6165235
 US5725611
 US5876468
 EP1233990
 EP1226188
    - N. A. PLATE; V. P. SHIBAEV, "Comb-Like Polymers. Structure and Properties", J. POLY. SCI. MACROMOLECULAR REVS., (1974), vol. 8, pages 117 - 253
    - Ullmann' s Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 5. Auflage, vol. A12, page 617 FF
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.