EP2813524 - Phosphorylated polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Alexander Unterer Pflüger 1 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 02 /
Knoll, Konrad Tannhäuserring 71 68199 Mannheim / DE | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13171206.9 | 10.06.2013 | [2014/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2813524 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/40, C08C19/24, C08L101/00, C08L101/02, C09K21/14, C09C3/10, B01F17/52, // C08F297/04, C08F8/46, C08F8/34, C08F8/36, C08F8/44, C08F8/12, C08L53/02, C08L77/02, C08L77/06, C08L67/02, C08J5/04 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
C09K21/14 (EP,US);
C08F236/10 (US);
C08F8/40 (EP,US);
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,US);
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/40, C08F8/44, C08F8/36, C08F297/04 (US,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F8/36, C08F297/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L53/025, C08L91/06, C08K7/14, C08K5/0008 (US,EP);
C08L77/02, C08K7/14, C08L53/025 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Phosphorylierte Polymere | [2014/51] | English: | Phosphorylated polymers | [2014/51] | French: | Polymères phosphorylés | [2014/51] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 18.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2863834 (BUCKMANN JOHN P) [X] 1,5-7,12,13 * examples I-IV; claims 1,6 *; | [A]US3577357 (WINKLER DE LOSS E) [A] 2-4,10,11 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2012152805 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [AD] 16* example -; claims 1-4,6-9 *; | [XI] - NIFANT'YEV E Y ET AL, "Hydrophosphorylation of synthetic rubbers", POLYMER SCIENCE U.S.S.R, PERGAMON, vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0032-3950(83)90228-9, ISSN 0032-3950, (1983), pages 472 - 479, (19830101), XP024129331 [X] 1,5-8,13 * abstract * * page 473, paragraph 1 - page 474, paragraph 2 * * page 475, paragraph L - page 477, paragraph 3 * * page 477, paragraph 6 - page 478, paragraph 1 * [I] 9,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3950(83)90228-9 | [XI] - BROSSE J C ET AL, "Modification chimique du polybutadiene-1,2 par le phosphonate d'ethyle", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, vol. 19, no. 12, doi:10.1016/0014-3057(83)90013-7, ISSN 0014-3057, (1983), pages 1159 - 1165, (19830101), XP024053499 [X] 1,5,7,13 * abstract * * Seite 1159, linke Spalte, Absatz "INTRODUCTION" * [I] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-3057(83)90013-7 | [XD] - C. AZUMA ET AL, "Phosphonylation of a polypentenamer and preparation of its hydrogenated derivatives", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (1977), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1002/pol.1977.170150304, ISSN 0360-6376, pages 547 - 560, XP055087511 [XD] 1,5,7,12,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1977.170150304 | by applicant | US2071250 | US2071251 | US2130523 | US2130948 | US2241322 | US2312966 | US2512606 | US2957931 | US3393210 | EP0038094 | EP0038582 | EP0039524 | DE4413177 | WO9740079 | EP0859803 | DE102006045869 | WO2008074687 | JP2009155436 | EP2100919 | EP1984438 | EP2223904 | US2010261818 | WO2012152805 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1959), vol. 81, pages 6275 - 6277 | - J. Polymer Science, Polymer Chemistry, (1977), vol. 15, pages 547 - 560 | - HADJICHRISTIDIS, Blockcopolymers, WILEY, (2003), pages 4 - 173 | - HSIEH; QUIRK, Anionic Polymerization, DECKER, pages 261 - 394 | - Ullmanns Enzyklopädie der Technischen Chemie, 4. Auflage,, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1980), vol. 19, pages 39 - 54 | - Ullmanns Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH VERLAG, (1992), pages 179 - 206 | - STOECKHERT, Kunststofflexikon, HANSER VERLAG, (1992), pages 425 - 428 |