Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
18.08.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.12.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |