EP2674550 - Stiffening element for fixing a swimming pool wall, fixing assembly, swimming pool and method of constructing of such a pool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abris et Filtrations Modernes Parc activites Mondaults 13 avenue des Mondaults 33270 Floirac / FR | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vidal, Lucien Domaine de la Pinpine 4 chemin du Grand Estey 33360 Latresne / FR | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Coquel, Jean-Marc Ipside Boîte postale CS 40009 7-9 allées Haussmann 33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Coquel, Jean-Marc SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111 Cours du Médoc CS 40009 33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13171691.2 | 12.06.2013 | [2013/51] | Priority number, date | FR20120055535 | 13.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1255535 | [2013/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2674550 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/00 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
E04H4/0043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Versteifungselement für die Befestigung einer Schwimmbadwand, Befestigungsanordnung, Schwimmbad uund Methode zum Bau eines solchen Schwimmbads | [2013/51] | English: | Stiffening element for fixing a swimming pool wall, fixing assembly, swimming pool and method of constructing of such a pool | [2013/51] | French: | Elément raidisseur pour la fixation d'une paroi de piscine, ensemble de fixation, piscine et procédé de construction d'une telle piscine | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 18.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3444659 (SHANNI VINCENT) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 45; figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]US2006179561 (RIBEIRO JOSE L W [BR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 6,14 *; | [A]US3551920 (GREEPE SAMUEL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3654640 (KATZMAN FREDERICK) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,4 * |