EP2653657 - Turbine blade having a constant thickness airfoil skin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marra, John J. 162 Nandina Terrace Winter Springs, FL 32708 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | McGowan, Nigel George Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13171837.1 | 17.02.2010 | [2013/43] | Priority number, date | US20090540430 | 13.08.2009 Original published format: US 540430 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2653657 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2653657 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/16 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
F01D5/147 (EP,US);
F01D11/008 (EP,US);
F01D5/16 (EP,US);
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F05D2230/233 (EP,US);
F05D2230/237 (EP,US);
F05D2230/54 (EP,US);
F05D2230/60 (EP,US);
F05D2240/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Title | German: | Turbinenschaufel mit Schaufelverkleidung mit konstanter Dicke | [2013/43] | English: | Turbine blade having a constant thickness airfoil skin | [2013/43] | French: | Aube de turbine ayant un revêtement de surface portante d'épaisseur constante | [2013/43] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10759747.8 / EP2464829 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2825530 (SCHUM EUGENE F, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3567333 (FEO ANGELO DE) [A] 1* figures 1-2 *; | [X]US4501053 (CRAIG HAROLD M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9321425 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [A] 3 * figure 5 *; | [I]US6416280 (FORRESTER JAMES MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * figures 2, 3, 5 *; | [X]US2007020102 (BEECK ALEXANDER R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figure 4 * |