EP2816536 - EMPTY GOODS RETURN MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/52] | Empty goods return machine | ||
[2016/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gergs, Roy Bussardweg 51 98693 Ilmenau / DE | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/52] | Schröder, Christoph Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 150920 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13172507.9 | 18.06.2013 | [2014/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816536 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816536 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/06 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
G07F7/0609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | LEERGUTRÜCKNAHMEAUTOMAT | [2016/08] | English: | EMPTY GOODS RETURN MACHINE | [2016/08] | French: | AUTOMATE DE REPRISE POUR BOUTEILLES CONSIGNÉES | [2016/08] |
Former [2014/52] | Leergutrücknahmeautomat | ||
Former [2014/52] | Empty goods return machine | ||
Former [2014/52] | Automate de reprise pour bouteilles consignées | Examination procedure | 26.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2013 | AL | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | IT | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | MT | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | IE | 18.06.2016 | LU | 18.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 18.06.2013 | |
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 18.06.2013 | |
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 18.06.2013 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
MT | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 18.06.2013 | |
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102011109392 (FINDBOX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0050]; figures 1-14; claims 1-15 * [I] 2-9; | [I]FR2970797 (INTUI SENSE [FR]) [I] 1-10 * figures 1-7; claims 1-8 *; | [I]US2010103131 (SEGAL MARA CLAIR [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0030]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] *; | [I]WO2012072835 (LOPEZ DE ARAGON LOPEZ DIEGO [ES]) [I] 1-10 * claims 1-5 *; | [XI]DE102010040177 (SIELAFF GMBH CO AUTOMATEN [DE]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-4; claims 1-12 * [I] 2-9; | [A]WO2009021227 (RECYCLEBANK LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2007086764 (KONICEK JEFFREY C [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]CN102981615 (AAC ACOUSTIC TECH SHENZHEN CO, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A] - Mario Morales ET AL, "VENDOR PROFILE Omek Interactive: Gesture Recognition and Machine Vision Technology for Intelligent Systems", (20120831), URL: http://www.smarttechnologyworld.com/pdf/omek.pdf, (20131028), XP055085512 [A] 1-10 * page 1 * * page 4 * | [A] - Anthony Wing Kosner, "Hug Me: Coca-Cola Introduces Gesture Based Marketing in Singapore - Forbes", (20121104), URL: http://www.forbes.com/sites/anthonykosner/2012/04/11/hug-me-coca-cola-introduces-gesture-based-marketing-in-singapore/, (20131028), XP055085515 [A] 1-10 * page 1 - page 2 * | by applicant | DE29812678U | US2008240502 | US7433024 | US2009185274 | US2010020078 |