EP2674757 - Agglutination assay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Platform Diagnostics Limited P.O. Box 88 Springstone House 27 Dewsbury Road Ossett West Yorkshire WF5 9WS / GB | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruddell, Carolyn, Jennifer 67 Hillfield Drive Heswall Wirral, CH61 6UJ / GB | 02 /
Allen, Gerald, John Beechfield 16A Old Lincoln Road Caythorpe, Lincolnshire NG32 3DF / GB | 03 /
Evans, Douglas, Robert 19 Speedwell Close Huntington Chester, CH3 6DX / GB | 04 /
Garner, Elizabeth 15 Darlington Road Platt Bridge Wigan, WN2 5BA / GB | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Shah, Punita, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2013/51] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13172799.2 | 13.11.2006 | [2013/51] | Priority number, date | GB20050023124 | 12.11.2005 Original published format: GB 0523124 | GB20060010973 | 03.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0610973 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2674757 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2674757 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/543, G01N33/548, G01N33/558, G01N33/53 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
G01N33/558 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | Agglutinierungstest | [2013/51] | English: | Agglutination assay | [2013/51] | French: | Analyse par agglutination | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 03.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06808497.9 / EP1952158 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060808497) is 21.06.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2045431 (TECHNICON INSTR) [I] 1-4,6-11 * p. 1, col. 1, lines 30 - 60, examples 1, 2 *; | [XI]EP0293779 (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 22,24,25 * Example 1, claims 1, 2 * [I] 1-4,6-15,17-20,23,26; | [XI]EP0310872 (HYGEIA SCIENCES LTD [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11-14,19,20,22,24,25 * examples, claims * [I] 2,5,9,10,15,17,18,23,26; | [IY]EP0516529 (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-4,6-11 * abstract, col. 2, lines 36 - 45, col. 3, line 43 - col. 4, line 8, col. 4, line 35 - col. 5, line 11, col. 5, lines 39 - 51, examples 2, 7, 10 - 13 * [Y] 2,19,20; | [XI]US5202267 (DITLOW CHARLES C [US], et al) [X] 22,24,25 * col. 12, line 57 - col. 13, line 57, claim 9, fig. 4 * [I] 3,4,6-9,11-14; | [I]WO9415193 (SIENNA BIOTECH INC [US]) [I] 1-4,6-15,19,20 * p. 8, lines 10 - 26, p. 11, lines 12 - 25, p. 15, line 15 - p. 17, line 2, examples 1, 4 *; | [I]US6136545 (HOESEL WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [I] 3-8,11 * Fig. 1, col. 2, line 27 - col. 3, line 50 *; | [XY]US6274325 (DEGER ARNO [DE], et al) [X] 3,4,6-9,11 * col. 2, lines 32 - 52, col. 3, line 8 - col. 4, line 57, Examples * [Y] 2,10,19,20; | [XAI]WO0240698 (SURROMED INC [US]) [X] 19,20 * p. 7, line 7 - p. 8, line 20, p. 18, lines 19 - 33, fig. 1 - 4 * [A] 12-15,22-26,171 [I] 1-11; | [XY]WO2004083859 (PLATFORM DIAGNOSTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11-15,17,18,22-26 * the whole document, particularly p. 5, p. 8, 3rd para., p. 10, p. 15 last para. - p. 18, fig. 1 - 3 * [Y] 2,10,19,20; | [A]US2004248222 (ROOT RICHARD T [US], et al) [A] 5* p. 12, par. [0103] - p. 13, par [0105] * |