EP2815807 - Capillary dialyzer comprising crimped hollow fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16 220 10 Lund / SE | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hornung, Markus Gomaringer Strasse 41 72147 Nehren / DE | 02 /
Wochner, Arnd Weiherstr. 28 72359 Dotternhausen / DE | 03 /
Buck, Reinhold Kirchstr. 24 88422 Alleshausen / DE | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Perchenek, Nils Gambro Dialysatoren GmbH Legal and Intellectual Property Holger Crafoord-Strasse 26 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2014/52] | Application number, filing date | 13172984.0 | 20.06.2013 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815807 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/02, A61M1/16, B01D69/08 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (CN);
A61M1/1621 (CN,US);
B01D61/243 (CN);
B01D63/031 (EP,CN,US);
B01D69/081 (CN,US);
B01D69/084 (EP,US);
B01D71/421 (EP,CN,US);
B01D71/56 (US);
B01D71/68 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hohlfaserdialysatoren | [2014/52] | English: | Capillary dialyzer comprising crimped hollow fibres | [2014/52] | French: | Dialyseurs capillaires | [2014/52] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 25.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2009034 (MONSANTO CO); | [A]JPS6422308 (ORGANO KK); | [A]EP1714692 (BRAUN MEDIZINTECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) |