EP2641936 - Method for molding polytetrafluoroethylene, polytetrafluoroethylene molded body, crosslinkable polytetrafluoroethylene, powered polytetrafluoroethylene crosslinked body, resin blend composition of matter and resin blend molded body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nanba, Yoshinori Daikin Industries Ltd. Yodogawa Plant 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | 02 /
Meiten, Koh Daikin Industries Ltd. Yodogawa Plant 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Scholz, Volker Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Scholz, Volker Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13173013.7 | 31.10.2006 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | JP20050317612 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005317612 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641936 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/18, B29C43/02, C08F214/26, C08J5/00 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
C08F214/265 (EP,US);
B29C43/003 (EP,US);
B29C43/006 (EP,US);
C08F114/26 (EP,US);
C08F14/26 (EP,US);
C08J3/247 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
C08J2327/18 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/26, C08F2/00 (EP,US);
C08L27/18, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Formen von Polytetrafluorethylen, geformter Polytetrafluorethylenkörper, vernetzbares Polytetrafluorethylen, vernetzter Körper aus pulverförmigem Polytetrafluorethylen, Substanzzusammensetzung aus Harzmischung und geformter Körper aus Harzmischung | [2013/39] | English: | Method for molding polytetrafluoroethylene, polytetrafluoroethylene molded body, crosslinkable polytetrafluoroethylene, powered polytetrafluoroethylene crosslinked body, resin blend composition of matter and resin blend molded body | [2013/39] | French: | Procédé servant à mouler du polytétrafluoroéthylène, corps moulé de polytétrafluoroéthylène, polytétrafluoroéthylène réticulable, corps réticulé de polytétrafluoroéthylène en poudre, composition de mélange de résines et corps moulé de mélange de résines | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 26.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06822690.1 / EP1947144 | EP12179831.8 / EP2527397 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03234753 ; | [A]EP0106180 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,2,7 *; | [X]EP0767467 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * example 4 *; | [A]EP0842959 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * examples 2,8 *; | [A]JP2000319471 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-4* example - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 48, Database accession no. 1991-350012, XP002701497 & JPH03234753 A 19911018 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * example - * |