Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013341135 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2781540 | 26.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014005940 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2781540 | 26.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103511514 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2781540 | 26.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2679852 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2781540 | 26.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102013016449 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2781540 | 26.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2781540 | 26.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2781540 | 26.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201413130 | 01.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2781540 | 26.06.2012 |