EP2701480 - Package structure and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Katsuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Schultes, Stephan Haseltine Lake LLP 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/09] | Application number, filing date | 13173397.4 | 24.06.2013 | [2014/09] | Priority number, date | JP20120185877 | 24.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012185877 | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2701480 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
H05K9/0032 (EP,US);
H05K9/0007 (US);
H01L23/552 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73253 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16251 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verpackungsstruktur und elektronische Vorrichtung | [2014/09] | English: | Package structure and electronic apparatus | [2014/09] | French: | Structure d'emballage et appareil électronique | [2014/09] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH08213500 | JP2004260103 |