Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
28.01.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.08.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.07.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.03.2018 | Change - representative | |
09.03.2018 | Change - designated states | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
24.11.2017 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
31.08.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.08.2017 | First examination report | |
28.07.2017 | Publication of search report | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 | Change - classification | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 | Change - classification | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
05.07.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.07.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.01.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
06.12.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |