EP2644587 - Process and intermediates for preparing integrase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dowdy, Eric 506 Hamlin Court White Rock, New Mexico 87544 / US | 02 /
Chen, Xi 3576 Sunnydays Lane Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 03 /
Pfeiffer, Steven 2727 Foxglove Ct. Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [2014/20] |
Former [2013/40] | 01 /
Dowdy, Eric 1151 Compass Lane, Nr. 203 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
Chen, Xi 3576 Sunnydays Lane Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | |||
03 /
Pfeiffer, Steven 2727 Foxglove Ct. Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13174174.6 | 11.09.2007 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | US20060844020P | 12.09.2006 Original published format: US 844020 P | US20070905365P | 07.03.2007 Original published format: US 905365 P | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2644587 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2644587 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/30, C07C43/225, C07C43/23, C07C51/367, C07C65/24, C07C67/343, C07C69/738, C07C227/16, C07C227/18, C07C229/34, C07D215/56, C07D233/54, C07D233/60 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
C07D215/56 (EP,US);
C07C63/68 (NO);
C07C65/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07C65/21 (CN);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C211/26 (KR);
C07C227/10 (US);
C07C227/16 (EP,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
C07C41/28 (EP,US);
C07C41/30 (EP,US);
C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07C51/347 (KR);
C07C51/367 (EP,NO,US);
C07C51/377 (US);
C07C67/18 (US);
C07C67/343 (EP,US);
C07D233/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/60 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C227/16, C07C229/34 (US,EP);
C07C227/18, C07C229/34 (US,EP);
C07C41/28, C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C41/30, C07C43/23 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zwischenprodukte zur Herstellung von Integrasehemmern | [2013/40] | English: | Process and intermediates for preparing integrase inhibitors | [2013/40] | French: | Procédé et intermédiaires pour préparer des inhibiteurs d'intégrase | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07842242.5 / EP2069280 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070842242) is 22.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0248113 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract ** page 86; example 2 *; | [Y]WO2004013103 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract *; | [YDA]EP1564210 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [YD] 1,11,12,19,20,23 * claim - * * Example 4-32; pages 59-61 * [A] 2-10,13-18,21,22; | [YA]WO2005113509 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1,11,12,19,20,23 * abstract * * Reference Example 9; pages 112-116 * [A] 2-10,13-18,21,22; | [YA]WO2005112930 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1,11,12,19,20,23 * abstract * * pages 41-47; example 1 * [A] 2-10,13-18,21,22; | [E]WO2007102512 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [E] 1 * abstract *; | EP1992607 [ ] (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | WO2004046115 | WO2005113508 |