EP2818162 - A composition for use in the treatment of intervertebral disc-related pain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Encubator AB Vera Sandbergs Allé 8 411 33 Göteborg / SE | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olmarker, Kjell Gustavsgatan 35 431 66 MÖLNDAL / SE | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Östergren, Markus, et al Awapatent AB Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Mellgren, Maria Charlotta, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 13174315.5 | 28.06.2013 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2818162 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/05, A61K31/06, A61K31/165, A61K31/4045, A61K31/60, A61P19/02 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/05 (EP);
A61K31/06 (EP);
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/4045 (EP);
A61K31/60 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Verwendung bei der Behandlung von Schmerzen im Zusammenhang mit der Zwischenwirbelscheibe | [2015/01] | English: | A composition for use in the treatment of intervertebral disc-related pain | [2015/01] | French: | Composition destinée à être utilisée dans le traitement de la douleur liée au disque intervertébral | [2015/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004058286 (ALGORX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] * * paragraph [0115]; claims 16,17 *; | [X]JP2004175723 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-15 * abstract *; | [X]WO2006066419 (MESTEX AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * * page 12, paragraph 5 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 2; examples 19,24; claim 10 *; | [X]US2007253930 (ROY JOSEE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0022]; claims 1,18 *; | [X]WO2006069452 (MESTEX AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * * claim 10 *; | [X]US2007253928 (ROY JOSEE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003104085 (YEOMANS DAVID C [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - DENG, HAIFENG ET AL, "Capsaicin injection for prevention of lumbago after epidural anesthesia", ZHONGGUO XIANDAI YIXUE ZAZHI , 18(7), 944-945, 948 CODEN: ZXYZAL; ISSN: 1005-8982, (2008), XP002715776 [X] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * | [X] - MILNE J. ONGLEY ET AL, "A new approach to the treatment of chronic low back pain", THE LANCET, GB, (19870718), vol. 330, no. 8551, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(87)92340-3, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 143 - 146, XP055085917 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(87)92340-3 | [X] - KOMAR J ET AL, "[TRANS-SACRAL PHENOL TREATMENT OF SCIATICA PAIN].", THERAPIE DER GEGENWART JUN 1964, (196406), vol. 103, ISSN 0040-5965, pages 748 - 753, XP008165639 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - DAGENAIS S ET AL, "Intraligamentous injection of sclerosing solutions (prolotherapy) for spinal pain: a critical review of the literature", THE SPINE JOURNAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 1529-9430, (20050501), pages 310 - 328, (20050501), XP027666284 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - KEITEL WOLFGANG ET AL, "Capsicum pain plaster in chronic non-specific low back pain", ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG, (2001), vol. 51, no. 11, ISSN 0004-4172, pages 896 - 903, XP008165654 [X] 1-5,7,8,10-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0031-1300134 | [X] - KIM SEON ET AL, "Nanoparticle formulation for controlled release of capsaicin.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (201105), Database accession no. NLM21780502, XP002715778 [X] 1-5,7,8,10-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1166/jnn.2011.3636 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF NANOSCIENCE AND NANOTECHNOLOGY MAY 2011, (201105), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 1533-4880, pages 4586 - 4591 | [X] - KLEIN R G ET AL, "A randomized double-blind trial of dextrose-glycerine-phenol injections for chronic, low back pain.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199302), Database accession no. NLM8439713, XP002720367 [X] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002517-199302000-00005 | [X] - JOURNAL OF SPINAL DISORDERS FEB 1993, (199302), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 0895-0385, pages 23 - 33, XP008167477 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002517-199302000-00005 | [X] - DAGENAIS SIMON ET AL, "Acute toxicity evaluation of proliferol: a dose-escalating, placebo-controlled study in swine", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF TOXICOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20090501), vol. 28, no. 3, doi:10.1177/1091581809336478, ISSN 1091-5818, pages 219 - 229, XP008165638 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1091581809336478 | [X] - SHIODA, MASANOBU, "Intradiscal injection of hypertonic saline, phenol -glycerin, and osmic acid for the treatment of lumbar disk herniation . An experimental study", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:469159, URL: STN, XP002720368 [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [X] - KOMAR J ET AL, "Die transsakrale Phenolbehandlung von Ischias-Schmerzen - [TRANS-SACRAL PHENOL TREATMENT OF SCIATICA PAIN]", THERAPIE DER GEGENWART, URBAN UND VOGEL, MUENCHEN, DE, (19640601), vol. 103, ISSN 0040-5965, pages 748 - 753, XP008165639 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2005046746 | - "Studies on the Pathology of Low Back Pain", THE JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, (195905), vol. 41 B, no. 2, pages 237 - 243 |