EP2690866 - Online video distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WireWax Limited 5 Percy Street London W1T 1DG / GB | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Callanan, Steven James 20 Melrose Road London, greater London SW18 1NE / GB | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin David, et al Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | MacLean, Martin David Downing Intellectual Property LLP Oak House Oak End Way Gerrards Cross Buckinghamshire SL9 8BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13174951.7 | 03.07.2013 | [2014/05] | Priority number, date | GB20120013015 | 23.07.2012 Original published format: GB 201213015 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690866 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/088, G06F17/30, G06T1/00, H04N21/434, H04N21/4725, H04N21/858 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
H04N21/4341 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (GB,US);
G11B27/3072 (US);
G06F16/748 (EP,GB,US);
G06F16/9558 (GB);
G11B27/036 (US);
G11B27/34 (US);
H04N21/4725 (EP,GB,US);
H04N21/4782 (GB);
H04N21/8455 (GB);
H04N21/8547 (GB);
H04N21/8583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Online-Videoverteilung | [2014/05] | English: | Online video distribution | [2014/05] | French: | Distribution de vidéo en ligne | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2017 | 23.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/41] | 31.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.06.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9743736 (DIGIMARC CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-16* pages 61,131 *; | [I]WO0043899 (HOTV INC [US]) [I] 1-16 * pages 30-31; figures 10-12 *; | [I]US2011088075 (EYER MARK [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0031] , [0044] - [0046]; figures 7a,7b,8a,8b; claim 7 *; | [A] - PEDRO A HERNANDEZ-AVALOS ET AL, "Video watermarking scheme resistant to MPEG compression", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2009. MWSCAS '09. 52ND IEEE INTERNATIONAL MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090802), ISBN 978-1-4244-4479-3, pages 853 - 858, XP031527965 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |