EP2821589 - Mining machine cutting head drive assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandl, Erich Murweg 44A 8734 Grosslobming / AT | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13175080.4 | 04.07.2013 | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821589 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2821589 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21C27/24, E21C31/02 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
E21C27/24 (EP);
E21C31/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bergbaumaschinenschneidkopf-Antriebsmontage | [2015/02] | English: | Mining machine cutting head drive assembly | [2015/02] | French: | Ensemble d'entraînement de la tête de coupe de machine d'exploitation minière | [2015/02] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2013 | AL | 28.10.2015 | AT | 28.10.2015 | BE | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | ES | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | IT | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | NL | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | RS | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | SM | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | NO | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | IE | 04.07.2016 | LU | 04.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BG | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BG | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 04.07.2016 | ||
LU | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6158818 (SCHAEFF HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,13,14 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 37 * [I] 10-12; | [A]US3797888 (HALLER H, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 60-68 *; | [A]US5108154 (BRANDL ERICH [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 22 *; | [A]AT393151B (VOEST ALPINE ZELTWEG [AT]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, lines 46-50 *; | [AD]US2011156470 (ZIMMERMAN JOSEPH J [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [A]US3966257 (SHAH ARVIND K) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2476575 | WO0036230 | US4047763 | GB2018329 |