EP2647712 - Microsphere-based composition for preventing and/or reversing new-onset autoimmune diabetes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare S.A. Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Baxter International Inc One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | ||
For all designated states Baxter Healthcare S.A. Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | |||
For all designated states University of Pittsburgh of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center O'Hara & Thackeray Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Larry R. 25 Sumner Street Newton, MA 02459 / US | 02 /
Giannoukakis, Nick 126 Herbst Road Coraopolis, PA 15108 / US | 03 /
Gillis, Kimberly A. 47 Draper Avenue Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13175410.3 | 06.08.2007 | [2013/41] | Priority number, date | US20060835742P | 04.08.2006 Original published format: US 835742 P | US20060864914P | 08.11.2006 Original published format: US 864914 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2647712 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2647712 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/113, A61K31/7088, A61K9/16, A61K9/50, A61P3/10 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2320/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | C12N15/11, C12N15/113, A61K31/713, A61K9/16, A61K9/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung auf Mikrokügelchenbasis zur Vorbeugung und/oder Umkehrung einer Neuerkrankung an autoimmun bedingter Diabetes | [2013/41] | English: | Microsphere-based composition for preventing and/or reversing new-onset autoimmune diabetes | [2013/41] | French: | Composition à base de microsphères destinée à la prévention et/ou inversion de nouveaux cas de diabète auto-immun | [2013/41] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 19.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07813820.3 / EP2056883 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070813820) is 06.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0128524 (EPIC THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005112885 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figure 1; examples 1-3; sequence 1 *; | [I]WO2005112894 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * example 4; sequence 1 *; | [IP]WO2007031333 (NOVOSOM AG [DE], et al) [IP] 1-10 * examples 9-11 *; | [X] - MACHEN ET AL, "Antisense oligonucleosides down-regulating costimulation confer diabetes-preventtive properties to nonobese diabetic mouse dendritic cells", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20041001), vol. 173, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4331 - 4341, XP008103972 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - MOORE WAYNE V ET AL, "Prevention of autoimmune diabetes in the DRBB rat by CD40/154 blockade", JOURNAL OF AUTOIMMUNITY, LONDON, GB, (20021030), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.1006/JAUT.2002.0605, ISSN 0896-8411, pages 139 - 145, XP002443303 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jaut.2002.0605 | [A] - KLEIN D ET AL, "A functional CD40 receptor is expressed in pancreatic beta cells", DIABETOLOGIA ; CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL DIABETES AND METABOLISM, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050203), vol. 48, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00125-004-1645-7, ISSN 1432-0428, pages 268 - 276, XP019322454 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-004-1645-7 | [A] - AKHTAR S ET AL, "Antisense oligonucleotide delivery to cultured macrophages is improved by incorporation into sustained-release biodegradable polymer microspheres", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0378-5173(97)04887-4, (19970512), vol. 151, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 57 - 67, XP002099631 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(97)04887-4 | [T] - PHILLIPS B ET AL, "A microsphere-based vaccine prevents and reverses new-onset autoimmune diabetes", DIABETES, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, US LNKD- DOI:10.2337/DB07-0507, vol. 57, no. 6, ISSN 0012-1797, (20080303), pages 1544 - 1555,1, (20080226), XP002541959 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/db07-0507 | by applicant | US4530840 | EP0248531 | US4897268 | US4904479 | US5075109 | US5102872 | US5149543 | US5213812 | US5360610 | US5384133 | US5417986 | US5578709 | US5599719 | US5981719 | US6090925 | US6268053 | US6458387 | US2006024240 |