EP2684639 - A method for manufacturing a variator disc for use in a toroidal continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 41550 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchis, Renato Via Guido Reni 96/110 I-10136 Torino / IT | 02 /
Richaud, Stefano Via Roma, 28 I-10069 Villar Perosa (TO) / IT | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Tedeschini, Luca SKF Industrie S.p.A. Via Pinerolo, 44 10060 Airasca (TO) / IT | [2014/03] | Application number, filing date | 13175421.0 | 05.07.2013 | [2014/03] | Priority number, date | IT2012TO00622 | 13.07.2012 Original published format: IT TO20120622 | [2014/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2684639 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23P13/02, B23B5/40, F16H15/38, // B23B31/12, B23B31/40 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
B23B31/1207 (EP,US);
B23B5/36 (US);
B23B31/4033 (EP,US);
B23B5/40 (EP,US);
B23P13/02 (EP,US);
B23P15/14 (US);
B23Q3/062 (US);
B25B5/14 (US);
F16H15/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Variatorscheibe zur Verwendung in einem stufenlosen Toroidgetriebe | [2014/03] | English: | A method for manufacturing a variator disc for use in a toroidal continuously variable transmission | [2014/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un disque de variateur pour une utilisation dans une transmission à variation continue toroïdale | [2014/03] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002013123 (KAMAMURA YUKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]US2003084560 (YASUHARA SHINJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-7 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP1380769 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] ** figure 4 *; | [A]JP2004286166 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US2005070400 (HIRATA KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 2A-6 *; | [A]US2005215184 (HIRATA KIYOTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0094] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO2012077354 (NSK LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US6637107 |