EP2658197 - Programmable receiver equalization circuitry and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maangat, Simardeep c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
Shumarayev, Sergey c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 03 /
Wong, Wilson c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 04 /
Tran, Thungoc c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/44] | 01 /
Maangat, Simardeep c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA California 95134 / US | ||
02 /
Shumarayev, Sergey c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA California 95134 / US | |||
03 /
Wong, Wilson c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA California 95134 / US | |||
04 /
Tran, Thungoc c/o Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA California 95134 / US | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13175861.7 | 10.07.2006 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | US20050182658 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: US 182658 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2658197 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2658197 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2658197 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
H04L25/03885 (EP,US);
H04B3/04 (EP,US);
H04L25/03019 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | H04L25/03, H04B3/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2018/38] |
Former [2013/44] | DE, GB | Title | German: | Programmierbare Empfängerentzerrungsschaltung und Verfahren | [2013/44] | English: | Programmable receiver equalization circuitry and methods | [2013/44] | French: | Circuit et procédés d'égalisation de récepteur programmable | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06014235.3 / EP1744510 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060014235) is 04.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5257286 (RAY DANIEL L [US]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 61 - column 5, line 2 *; | [I]US2004141552 (YANG FUJI [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * figures 1,2,6 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A] - GONDI S ET AL, "A 10Gb/s CMOS adaptive equalizer for backplane applications", SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2005. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. ISS CC. 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA FEB. 6-10, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050101), ISBN 978-0-7803-8904-5, pages 328 - 601Vol.1, XP031173779 [A] 1,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCC.2005.1494002 | Examination | US6303922 | US2005123036 |