EP2651141 - Method and apparatus for stereoscopic data processing based on digital multimedia broadcasting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-700 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-700 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yun, Kug Jin No. 106-1504 Hoban Regencyvill Songnimmaeul Hagi-dong Yuseong-gu 305-759 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
Lee, Bong Ho No. 512-1108 Chungsol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu 305-752 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
Lee, Hyun No. 108-602 Saemmeori Apt. Dunsan-dong Seo-gu 302-120 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
Hur, Nambo No. 801-1001 Yeolmae Maeul Apt. Noeun-dong Yuseong-gu 305-768 Daejeon / KR | 05 /
Kim, Jin Woong No. 305-1603 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu 305-761 Daejeon / KR | 06 /
Lee, Soo In No. 106-606 Clover Apt. Dunsan-dong Seo-gu 302-120 Daejeon / KR | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13176237.9 | 09.05.2008 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | KR20070129343 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: KR 20070129343 | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651141 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/6332 (EP,US);
H04N21/6336 (EP,US);
H04N21/64315 (EP,US);
H04N21/654 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur stereoskopischen Datenverarbeitung auf der Basis von digital-multimedia-Ausstrahlung | [2013/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for stereoscopic data processing based on digital multimedia broadcasting | [2013/42] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour traitement de données stéréoscopiques sur la base d'une diffusion multimédia numérique | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 19.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08753406.1 / EP2229785 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5748199 (PALM CHARLES S [US]) [X] 1 * column 28, line 46 - line l; figures 25,26 * [Y] 2-6; | [XY]WO2007064159 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * [Y] 2,3,6; | [Y]EP1855488 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 2-6 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066]; figure 9 ** paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * |