blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2690886

EP2690886 - Method and apparatus for microphone beamforming [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/05]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Maenpaa, Ossi
Ristinkedonkatu 10
24240 Salo / FI
02 / Makitalo, Kimmo
Hylliniitynkatu 17 as 2
33820 Tampere / FI
03 / Tammi, Mikko
Kohmankaari 1 C 13
33310 Tampere / FI
04 / Virolainen, Jussi
Kuunkierros 3 B 12
02210 Espoo / FI
05 / Kelloniemi, Antti
Kluuvintie 9 N
02180 Espoo / FI
 [2014/05]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy
Hermiankatu 1 B
33720 Tampere / FI
Former [2014/05]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date13176635.416.07.2013
[2014/05]
Priority number, dateUS20121356001527.07.2012         Original published format: US201213560015
[2014/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2690886
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2013
ClassificationIPC:H04R3/00, // H04R1/02, H04R1/40
[2014/05]
CPC:
H04R3/005 (EP,US); H04R1/028 (EP,US); H04R1/406 (EP,US);
H04R2201/401 (EP,US); H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und zur Vorrichtung zur Mikrofonstrahlformung[2014/05]
English:Method and apparatus for microphone beamforming[2014/05]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la formation de faisceaux de microphone[2014/05]
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
28.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.02.2016
04.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/25]
04.02.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.02.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010110232  (ZHANG MING [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [X]US2011317041  (ZUREK ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0132] *;
 [X]US2010245624  (BEAUCOUP FRANCK [CA]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0087] *;
 [X]US2009060222  (JEONG SO-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [A]WO2011099167  (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 16, line 10; figures 1-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.