EP2687380 - Thermal transfer film and organic electroluminescent device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheil Industries Inc. 290, Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-030 / KR | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Si Kyun Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kang, Kyoung Ku Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Se Hyun Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jung Hyo Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Cho, Seong Heun Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Michalski, Stefan Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13176811.1 | 17.07.2013 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | KR20120079549 | 20.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120079549 | KR20130015480 | 13.02.2013 Original published format: KR 20130015480 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2687380 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2687380 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/46, H01L51/00 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
B41M5/465 (EP,US);
H01J9/20 (US);
B41M5/38242 (US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
H10K71/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | B41M5/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmetransferfolie und organische elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung | [2014/04] | English: | Thermal transfer film and organic electroluminescent device | [2014/04] | French: | Film de transfert thermique et dispositif organique électroluminescent | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009008576 (SHIM ANNE K [US], et al); | [A]EP2361783 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2012091243 (CHEIL IND INC [KR], et al); | US2013287974 [ ] (LEE JUNG HYO [KR], et al) | by applicant | KR20100028652 |