EP2695862 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A LONG GLASS BODY AS WELL AS THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/07] | Method and device for forming a long glass body as well as the use thereof | ||
[2015/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartsch, Reiner Goethestrasse 8 95643 Tirschenreuth / DE | 02 /
Biersack, Ralf Robert-Koch-Strasse 7 95173 Schönwald / DE | 03 /
Pulz, Wolfgang Wetley-Rocks-Strasse 18 95666 Mitterteich / DE | 04 /
Debreczeny, Csaba Pressather Strasse 126/b 92637 Weiden / DE | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/43] |
Former [2014/07] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13176968.9 | 18.07.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | DE201210107338 | 09.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012107338 | [2014/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2695862 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2695862 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2695862 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C03B23/055, C03B23/045, C03B23/049 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
C03B23/055 (EP,KR,US);
C03B23/04 (KR);
C03B23/0493 (US);
C03B23/045 (KR,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | C03B23/055 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMFORMEN EINES LÄNGLICHEN GLASKÖRPERS SOWIE VERWENDUNG HIERVON | [2015/32] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A LONG GLASS BODY AS WELL AS THE USE THEREOF | [2015/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉFORMATION D'UN CORPS DE VERRE LONGITUDINAL ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/07] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umformen eines länglichen Glaskörpers sowie Verwendung hiervon | ||
Former [2014/07] | Method and device for forming a long glass body as well as the use thereof | ||
Former [2014/07] | Procédé et dispositif de déformation d'un corps de verre longitudinal et utilisation de celui-ci | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2013 | AL | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | IE | 18.07.2016 | LU | 18.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | DK | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | DK | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | DK | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]DE102006015223 (SCHOTT AG [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4-7,10,11,14 * paragraphs [0029] , [0034] - [0035]; figure 1; claims 1-2,14 * [I] 3,8,9,12,13,15; | [X]JPS5947629U (TOSHIBA GLASS CO., LTD) [X] 1-3,12 * letzter Absatz; page 6; figure 2 * | Examination | JP2006315919 | US4106847 | JPH03115131 | by applicant | DE545449 | DE1007962 | JP2006315919 | DE19856892 | DE102006015223 |