EP2826556 - Supported metal-based oxygen carrier and use in a chemical-looping process cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VITO NV (Vlaamse Instelling voor Technologisch Onderzoek NV) Boeretang 200 2400 Mol / BE | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Noyen, Jasper Laarstraat 91 2610 Wilrijk / BE | 02 /
Snijkers, Frans Rozenlaan 68 3930 Hamont-Achel / BE | 03 /
Thijs, Ivo Lijsterdreef 5 2400 Mol / BE | 04 /
Lyngfelt, Anders Intitutionen för Energi och Miljö Avdelning Energiteknik Chamlers Tekniska Högskola S-412 96 Göteborg / SE | 05 /
Mattisson, Tobias Intitutionen för Energi och Miljö Avdelning Energiteknik Chamlers Tekniska Högskola S-412 96 Göteborg / SE | 06 /
Jerndal, Erik Intitutionen för Energi och Miljö Avdelning Energiteknik Chamlers Tekniska Högskola S-412 96 Göteborg / SE | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13176975.4 | 18.07.2013 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826556 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/04, B01J23/755, B01J37/00 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B01J23/755 (EP);
B01J23/78 (EP);
B01J35/40 (EP);
B01J37/0036 (EP);
B01J37/0045 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Unterstützter Sauerstoffträger auf Metallbasis und Verwendung in einem chemischen Looping-Verfahrenszyklus | [2015/04] | English: | Supported metal-based oxygen carrier and use in a chemical-looping process cycle | [2015/04] | French: | Transporteur d'oxygène à base de métal supporté et son utilisation dans un cycle de traitement en boucle chimique | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 22.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0047320 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 27 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]WO2012121761 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0084] * [I] 2-10; | [XI] - GAYAN P ET AL, "NiO/Al2O3 oxygen carriers for chemical-looping combustion prepared by impregnation and deposition-precipitation methods", FUEL, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 88, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.FUEL.2008.12.007, ISSN 0016-2361, (20090103), pages 1016 - 1023, (20090103), XP025952804 [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [2.1.3] - paragraph [03.4]; figure 9; table 2 * [I] 3-5,8-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2008.12.007 | [I] - MATTISSON T ET AL, "The use of NiO as an oxygen carrier in chemical-looping combustion", FUEL, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 85, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.FUEL.2005.07.021, ISSN 0016-2361, (20060301), pages 736 - 747, (20060301), XP028064454 [I] 11-13 * page 739, paragraph 3.1.1 - page 740, paragraph 3.1.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2005.07.021 | by applicant | WO2004014793 | WO2012140292 |