EP2687938 - Measuring time offsets between devices with independent silicon clocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bock, Anthony S. 14106 SE 35th St. Vancouver, WA Washington 98683 / US | 02 /
Stanton, Kevin B. 18661 SW Neugebauer Rd. Hillsboro, OR Oregon 97123 / US | 03 /
Falik, Ohad Shizaf 4B 44418 Kfar Saba / IL | 04 /
Hunsaker, Mikal C. 1646 Hedland Pl. El Dorado Hills, CA California 95762 / US | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13176986.1 | 18.07.2013 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | US201261673205P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673205 P | US201261673208P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673208 P | US201261673212P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673212 P | US201261673213P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673213 P | WO2013US32462 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: PCT/US2013/032462 | US201261673210P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673210 P | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2687938 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2687938 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/04, // H04J3/06 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G06F1/12 (EP);
H04J3/0697 (EP);
H04J3/0667 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2014/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Messung der Zeitversätze zwischen Vorrichtungen mit unabhängigen Siliziumuhren | [2014/04] | English: | Measuring time offsets between devices with independent silicon clocks | [2014/04] | French: | Mesure de décalages de temps entre des dispositifs ayant des horloges en silicone indépendantes | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011150005 (CHEN HAN-CHIANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,14,15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0043] * [Y] 6,7,11-13; | [XY]US2011051754 (LANSDOWNE RICHARD JAMES [GB]) [X] 1-5,8-10,14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * [Y] 6,7,11-13; | [X]WO2011058625 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,10,14,15 * figures 1, 2 *; | [P]US2012224492 (KITAYAMA KENJI [JP], et al) [P] * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] *; | [Y]US2006109868 (SCHOPP MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 6,7,11-13 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0053] * |