EP2695620 - Caprylate viral deactivation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grifols, S.A. C/Jesús y María, 6 08022 Barcelona / ES | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebing, Wytold 2309 NW 90TH Street Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 02 /
Burns, Doug 2007 Nancy Ann Drive Raleigh, NC 27529 / US | 03 /
Roth, Nathan 4909 Sunset Forest Circle Holly Springs, NC 27540 / US | 04 /
Hotta, Joann 916 Macon Place Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 13177014.1 | 18.07.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | US201261681265P | 09.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261681265 P | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695620 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2695620 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/38, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, C07K14/765, C12N7/06 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/38 (RU);
C07K14/76 (KR,US);
C07K14/765 (CN);
A01N37/02 (US);
A61K47/12 (RU);
A61K47/14 (RU);
C07K1/14 (KR);
C12N7/04 (KR);
C12N7/06 (CN);
A61K2121/00 (RU);
C12N2760/20263 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24363 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2014/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Caprylatvirus-Deaktivierung | [2014/07] | English: | Caprylate viral deactivation | [2014/07] | French: | Désactivation de la caprylate virale | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | LU | 18.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 15.06.2016 | |
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | CY | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | DK | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1479393 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0696595 (BAYER AG [US]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005014648 (OCTAPHARMA AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005082937 (OCTAPHARMA AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * | [Y] - JOHNSTON A ET AL, "LOW PH, CAPRYLATE INCUBATION AS A SECOND VIRAL INACTIVATION STEP IN THE MANUFACTURE OF ALBUMIN PARAMETRIC AND VALIDATION STUDIES", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20030901), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S1045-1056(03)00062-9, ISSN 1045-1056, pages 213 - 221, XP001149490 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1045-1056(03)00062-9 | [Y] - KORNEYEVA M ET AL, "ENVELOPED VIRUS INACTIVATION BY CAPRYLATE: A ROBUST ALTERNATIVE TO SOLVENT-DETERGENT TREATMENT IN PLASMA DERIVED INTERMEDIATES", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20020601), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.1006/BIOL.2002.0334, ISSN 1045-1056, pages 153 - 162, XP001197368 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/biol.2002.0334 | [Y] - MPANDI ET AL, "Partitioning and inactivation of viruses by the caprylic acid precipitation followed by a terminal pasteurization in the manufacturing process of horse immunoglobulins", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20071001), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BIOLOGICALS.2007.02.004, ISSN 1045-1056, pages 335 - 341, XP022300726 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biologicals.2007.02.004 | by applicant | US2390074 | US2469193 | US2710293 | US2710294 | US4939176 | WO9824485 | WO0056768 | US5250663 | US5561115 | - COHN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1946), vol. 68, pages 459 - 475 | - COHN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1947), vol. 69, pages 1753 - 1761 | - LUNDBLAD; SENG, VOX SANG., (1991), vol. 60, pages 75 - 81 | - JOHNSTON; JONSTONE; WU, BIOLOGICALS, (2003), vol. 31, pages 213 - 221 |