EP2688260 - Methods and apparatus for adapting transmitter equalization coefficients based on receiver gain adaptation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1320 Ridder Park Dr. San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2017/22] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1320 Ridder Park Dr. San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sindalovsky, Vladimir 602 Highland Drive Perkasie, PA Pennsylvania 18944 / US | 02 /
Mobin, Mohammad S. 827 Rebecca Lane Orefield, PA Pennsylvania 18069 / US | 03 /
Smith, Lane A. 905 Schuyler Drive Easton, PA Pennsylvania 18040 / US | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2014/04] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13177107.3 | 18.07.2013 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | US201213552012 | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US201213552012 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2688260 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2688260 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2688260 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L27/01 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2014/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anpassung von Sendervorentzerrungskoeffizienten auf Basis von Empfängerverstärkungsanpassung | [2014/04] | English: | Methods and apparatus for adapting transmitter equalization coefficients based on receiver gain adaptation | [2014/04] | French: | Procédés et appareil pour l'adaptation des coefficients d'égalisation d'émetteur sur la base de l'adaptation de gain de récepteur | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2013 | AL | 31.05.2017 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | IT | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | RS | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | IE | 18.07.2017 | LU | 18.07.2017 | MT | 18.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | FR | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | GB | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GB | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RS | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5678198 (LEMSON PAUL H [US]) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 23 * | by applicant | US2010046598 |