EP2829570 - Curable composition and process for the manufacture of an epoxy thermoset [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 40, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2015/05] | Application number, filing date | 13177442.4 | 22.07.2013 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2829570 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/1535, C08L63/00, C08G59/40, C08G59/50 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
C08K5/1535 (EP);
C08G59/5046 (EP);
C09J163/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/1535, C08L63/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Härtbare Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wärmehärtbaren Epoxidharzes | [2015/05] | English: | Curable composition and process for the manufacture of an epoxy thermoset | [2015/05] | French: | Composition durcissable et procédé pour la fabrication d'un époxyde thermodurci | [2015/05] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2016/27] | 14.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3055914 (GARBER JOHN D, et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,12 * column 4, line 36 - line 40 * * page 1 * [I] 1-15; | [XI]US2995581 (JONES ROBERT E, et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10,12 * column 4, line 32 - line 36 * * column 5, line 20 - line 29 * * examples VI,VII * [I] 1-15; | [A]US2012232294 (SCHAUB THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0004]; table 8 * | [XI] - XIAODUN HE ET AL, "EVALUATION OF FURFURYLAMINES AS CURING AGENTS FOR EPOXY RESINS", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19920330), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0360-6376, pages 533 - 542, XP000258557 [X] 1,4,7,10,12 * figure 1 * [I] 1-15 | by applicant | US5208317 | US5109099 | US4981926 | US2750395 | US2890194 | US3018262 | US7163973 | US6632893 | US6242083 | US7037958 | US6572971 | US6153719 | US5405688 | US2006293172 | US2005171237 |