EP2689912 - Method and apparatus for forming a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gea Procomac S.p.A. Via Fedolfi, 29 43038 Sala Baganza (PR) / IT | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagliarini, Paolo GEA PROCOMAC S.p.A. Via Fedolfi, 29 43038 SALA BAGANZA (PR) / IT | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 13177843.3 | 24.07.2013 | [2014/05] | Priority number, date | IT2012PR00048 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: IT PR20120048 | [2014/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2689912 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2689912 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/42, A61L2/12, A61L2/18, // B29C49/46 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
A61L2/208 (EP);
B29C49/4252 (EP);
A61L2202/23 (EP);
B29C2035/0855 (EP);
B29C2049/4679 (EP);
B29C49/42405 (EP);
B29C49/42418 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Behälters | [2014/05] | English: | Method and apparatus for forming a container | [2014/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour former un récipient | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6984360 (FEUILLOLEY GUY [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2* paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0061] , [0066] , [0076]; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US2010047120 (ADRIANSENS ERIC [FR], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,7 * paragraphs [0065] - [0071]; figures 1,4 *; | [XY]US2011272861 (HUMELE HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0014] , [0016] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] - [0031]; figures 1-4; claims 1-4,7,8 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]EP2447038 (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0062] , [0064] , [0065]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US2011272861 |