EP2716405 - An extruded rotor, a steam turbine having an extruded rotor and a method for producing an extruded rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farineau, Thomas Joseph 1 River Road Schenectady, NY New York 12345 / US | 02 /
Saha, Deepak 1 River Road Schenectady, NY New York 12345 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Foster, Christopher Michael, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Cleary, Fidelma GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13177855.7 | 24.07.2013 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | US201213633340 | 02.10.2012 Original published format: US201213633340 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2716405 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2716405 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/00, B21C23/00, // F01D5/02, F01D5/06 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B23P15/006 (EP,US);
B21C23/085 (EP,US);
F01D5/02 (EP,US);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US);
F05D2230/24 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49339 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Extrudierter Rotor, eine Dampfturbine mit extrudiertem Rotor und Verfahren zum Herstellen eines extrudierten Rotors | [2014/15] | English: | An extruded rotor, a steam turbine having an extruded rotor and a method for producing an extruded rotor | [2014/15] | French: | Rotor extrudé, turbine à vapeur comportant un rotor extrudé et procédé de fabrication d'un rotor extrudé | [2014/15] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.02.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2312123 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0019] - [0021] - [0025] , [0026] , [0035] - [0038] - [0048]; figures 1,4D * * the whole document *; | [X]US6974508 (GABB TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12-14 * figures 1-5,15 * * column 3, line 55 - line 66 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 6 * * the whole document *; | [X]FR2372666 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3,9,12,15 * page 4, line 19 - line 35 * * page 7, line 2 - line 37 * * figure 2 *; | [X]GB2467523 (CUMMINS TURBO TECH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12 * figures 1-5 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 20 * * page 9, line 13 - line 16; figure 1 *; | [X]USH647H ((USAF ) US SEC OF AIR FORCE) [X] 1-3,9,10,12 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4669164 (PHELPS WILLIAM D [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9,14 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 58 - line 68 * * column 2, line 11 - line 22 *; | [X]EP2202013 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3,9,12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022]; figure - * |