EP2703126 - Hexagonal wrench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hu, Bobby 16F-2, No. 367, Gong Yi Road West District Taichung / TW | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13177943.1 | 25.07.2013 | [2014/10] | Priority number, date | TW20120131347 | 29.08.2012 Original published format: TW 101131347 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2703126 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Classification | IPC: | B25B23/00 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
B25B23/0028 (EP,US);
B25B23/0021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hexagonaler Schraubenschlüssel | [2014/10] | English: | Hexagonal wrench | [2014/10] | French: | Clé hexagonale | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US6443039 |