EP2693474 - Method of manufacturing a semiconductor die assembly with a clip bonded to an aluminium pad coated by a sintered silver structure and with a wire bonded to an uncoated aluminium pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/06] | Method of manufacturing a silver bond pad on a semiconductor power device using silver nanopaste, as well as an assembly including said semiconductor device | ||
[2020/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Littelfuse, Inc. 8755 West Higgins Road, Suite 500 Chicago, IL 60631 / US | [2019/37] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states IXYS CORPORATION 1590 Buckeye Drive Milpitas CA 95035-7418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zommer, Nathan 5111 SE 5th Avenue 1709 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [2020/48] |
Former [2014/06] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 13177989.4 | 25.07.2013 | [2014/06] | Priority number, date | US201213563703 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: US201213563703 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2693474 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2693474 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2693474 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L23/485, H01L23/488, H01L23/49, // H01L23/373, H01L23/495 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (US);
H01L23/49513 (EP,US);
H01L23/49524 (EP,US);
H01L23/49562 (EP,US);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/06 (EP,US);
H01L24/40 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03312 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0345 (EP,US);
H01L2224/035 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03505 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0381 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04026 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04034 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05073 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05076 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05083 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05155 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05166 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05187 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05553 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05624 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05639 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05687 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05794 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05839 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0589 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06181 (EP);
H01L2224/06505 (EP,US);
H01L2224/08238 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4007 (EP,US);
H01L2224/40225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/40247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/40475 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48463 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4903 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4911 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73221 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73251 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73263 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/80439 (EP,US);
H01L2224/80895 (EP,US);
H01L2224/84205 (EP,US);
H01L2224/84345 (EP);
H01L2224/84424 (EP,US);
H01L2224/84801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8484 (EP);
H01L2224/85181 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85205 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85424 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92157 (EP,US);
H01L2224/9222 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92246 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US);
H01L23/4827 (EP,US);
H01L24/08 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/72 (EP,US);
H01L24/80 (EP,US);
H01L24/84 (EP,US);
H01L24/85 (EP,US);
H01L24/92 (EP,US);
H01L24/95 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1301 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1305 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/0345, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/035, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05073, H01L2224/05639, H01L2224/05124, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05076, H01L2224/05187, H01L2924/05432, H01L2224/05139 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05083, H01L2224/05639, H01L2224/05155, H01L2224/05166, H01L2224/05124, H01L2924/00012, H01L2924/00015 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05124, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05187, H01L2924/05432 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05687, H01L2924/05432 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05794, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/05839, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/4911, H01L2924/00015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73251, H01L2224/08, H01L2224/40 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73251, H01L2224/08, H01L2224/48 (US,EP);
H01L2224/80439, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/84205, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/84424, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85181, H01L2224/48472, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85181, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85205, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85424, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/9222, H01L2224/80, H01L2224/84 (EP,US);
H01L2224/9222, H01L2224/80, H01L2224/85 (US,EP);
H01L2224/92, H01L2224/80, H01L2224/84, H01L2224/85 (US,EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/03 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/37099 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1301, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2014/41] | H01L23/485, H01L23/49, H01L23/488, H01L21/60, // H01L23/373, H01L23/495 | ||
Former IPC [2014/32] | H01L23/485, H01L23/49, H01L23/488, H01L21/60, // H01L23/495, H01L23/498 | ||
Former IPC [2014/06] | H01L23/485, // H01L23/495, H01L23/498 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2014/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleiterchipanordnung mit einem Clip, der mit einer gesinterten Silberstruktur beschichteten Aluminiumkontaktfläche verbunden ist, und mit einem Bonddraht, der mit einer unbeschichteten Aluminiumkontaktfläche verbunden ist | [2020/30] | English: | Method of manufacturing a semiconductor die assembly with a clip bonded to an aluminium pad coated by a sintered silver structure and with a wire bonded to an uncoated aluminium pad | [2020/27] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un assemblage d'une puce semi-conductrice avec un clip connecté à un plot de contact en aluminium recouvert d'une structure frittée en argent et avec un fil de connexion connecté à un plot de contact non-recouvert | [2020/27] |
Former [2014/06] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von einer Bondfläche auf einem Leistungshalbleiterbaustein mittels einer Silbernanopaste, sowie eine Anordnung den Halbleiterbaustein enthaltend | ||
Former [2014/06] | Method of manufacturing a silver bond pad on a semiconductor power device using silver nanopaste, as well as an assembly including said semiconductor device | ||
Former [2014/06] | Méthode de fabrication d'un plot de contact en argent sur un dispositif semi-conducteur de puissance à l'aide d'une nano-pâte d'argent, ainsi qu'un assemblage comprenant ce dispositif semi-conducteur | Examination procedure | 07.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2020 | 14.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20174492.7 / EP3742481 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2013 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | ES | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | IT | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SE | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | IE | 25.07.2021 | LU | 25.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1002267 (PHILCO CORP) [Y] 9 * page 4, lines 112-124 *; | [Y]GB1297046 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [Y] 5,12-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2001203243 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6798060 (STRAUCH GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2006190728 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0042] * * figures 1, 3 *; | [Y]EP2012352 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-8,11-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2009039516 (GOEBL CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2071619 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9,11-15 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0117] * * figures 2, 14-19 *; | [Y]US2009189259 (MOHAMED ABDUL RAHMAN [MY], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-9,11,15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0043] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2010078784 (OTREMBA RALF [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6-9,11,15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2011086743 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2011142172 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ZHANG ZH, "Processing and Characterization of Micro-scale and Nanscale Silver Paste for Power Semiconductor Device Attachment", (200509), URL: http://scholar.lib.vt.edu/theses/available/etd-09082005-231429/unrestricted/Dissertation_Zhiye__Zhang.pdf, (20140527), XP055120437 [Y] 1-9,11-15 * chapter 5.2, first paragraph * * chapter 6.2.3, penultimate paragraph * * figure 5.3 * | [Y] - ONUKI J ET AL, "The Low Temperature Bonding between Si and Electrode Using Sputtered Ag Films", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JP, (200210), vol. 41, no. 10, doi:10.1143/JJAP.41.5904, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 5904 - 5908, XP001162922 [Y] 5,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.41.5904 | [Y] - "Abrasive blasting", WIKIPEDIA, (20120730), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Abrasive_blasting&oldid=504941733, (20140808), XP055134075 [Y] 9 * first and second paragraphs * | [A] - SCHMITT W ET AL, "Sinter materials for broad process windows in DCB packages - concepts and results", INTEGRATED POWER ELECTRONICS SYSTEMS (CIPS), 2012 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, VDE VERLAG GMBH, (20120306), ISBN 978-3-8007-3414-6, pages 1 - 6, XP032181465 [A] 1-9,11-15 * section 2 * * section 3 * * section 3.4, first paragraph * * section 3.5 * | [A] - XU H ET AL, "A micromechanism study of thermosonic gold wire bonding on aluminum pad", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20101208), vol. 108, no. 11, doi:10.1063/1.3514005, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 113517-1 - 113517-8, XP012142045 [A] 1-4,6-9,11,15 * section I, first paragraph * * section IV, subsections A and B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3514005 | [A] - "Thermal Sonic Aluminum Wire Bonds To Aluminum Surfaces For Hybrid Integrated Circuit Connections", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (199312), no. 356, ISSN 0374-4353, XP000425386 [A] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document * | Examination | JP2002110750 | JP2010287554 | US2013328204 |