08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
19.03.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
10.04.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
05.04.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.12.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.09.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2019 |
First examination report |
|
21.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
31.07.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
27.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.01.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
26.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |