EP2695555 - Device for cleaning the milk system of fully automatic coffee machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortmann, Christoph Kirchenstrasse 2 81675 München / DE | 02 /
Sachon, Robert Holzstrasse 33 80469 München / DE | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 13178355.7 | 29.07.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | DE201210214102 | 08.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012214102 | [2014/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695555 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
A47J31/4485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Reinigung des Milchsystems bei Kaffeevollautomaten | [2014/07] | English: | Device for cleaning the milk system of fully automatic coffee machines | [2014/07] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage du système à lait dans des machines à café entièrement automatiques | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 13.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1878370 (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0025] * [Y] 4,5 [I] 6-10; | [Y]US3132656 (LILLIAN RANKIN) [Y] 4,5 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 12 - line 31 * * column 3, line 10 - line 17 *; | [XA]EP2353472 (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * [A] 2-10 |