EP2832956 - Turbine blade with airfoil-shaped cooling bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmad, Fathi Moselstr. 1 41564 Kaarst / DE | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13178387.0 | 29.07.2013 | [2015/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832956 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2212 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Turbinenschaufel mit tragflächenprofilförmigen Kühlkörpern | [2015/06] | English: | Turbine blade with airfoil-shaped cooling bodies | [2015/06] | French: | Aube de turbine avec corps de refroidissement en forme de profil aérodynamique | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 05.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 17.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5772397 (MORRIS MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-12 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,6; | [X]GB2349920 (ABB ALSTOM POWER CH AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0230917 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,9-12 * figures 10,11; examples 5,6 *; | [X]EP0034961 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1,2,7-12 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1239120 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,7-12 * figures 1-4 *; | [YA]EP1762700 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016]; figure 2 * [A] 1-3; | [Y]EP0992655 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5536143 (JACALA ARIEL [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7-12 * figures 1-18 *; | [A]EP2194232 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2458148 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-5 * |