EP2832237 - Method for producing hydrolysed keratinaceous material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tessenderlo Chemie NV Troonstraat 130 1050 Brussel / BE | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belmans, Marc Stationsstraat 84 3980 Tessenderlo / BE | 02 /
Boers, Frank Engsbergseweg 182 3980 Tessenderlo / BE | 03 /
Maertens, Faye Vroentestraat 38A 3290 Schaffen / BE | 04 /
Rogiers, Joeri Viverselweg 32 3550 Zolder / BE | 05 /
Fillières, Romain 15, rue du Capitaine Rouveure 27200 Vernon / FR | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | den Hartog, Jeroen H.J., et al Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | den Hartog, Jeroen H.J., et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 13178526.3 | 30.07.2013 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832237 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A23J1/10, A23J3/30, C08H1/06 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
A23J1/10 (EP,US);
C12P21/06 (CN);
A23J3/32 (US);
A23J3/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61K8/65 (EP,CN,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C07K1/12 (CN);
C08H1/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von hydrolysiertem keratinartigem Material | [2015/06] | English: | Method for producing hydrolysed keratinaceous material | [2015/06] | French: | Procédé de production de matériau contenant de la kératine hydrolysée | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 05.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/04] | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3806501 (PETERS T, et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4172073 (ALLEN WILLIAM M [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1, 8 *; | [A]GB2061956 (OREAL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011003015 (KERAPLAST TECH LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US2542984 | US3806501 | US4172073 | US4286884 | US5049397 | US5772968 | RU2206231 | EP1566482 | WO2010114938 | - S. BOISEN, "In vitro analysis for determining standardized ileal digestibility of protein and amino acids in actual batches of feedstuffs and diets for pigs", LIVESTOCK SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 309, pages 182 - 185 | - JOHNSON ET AL., "Effects of species raw material source, ash content, and processing temperature on amino acid digestibility of animal by-product meals by cecectomized roosters and ileally cannulated dogs", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 76, pages 1112 - 1122 |