EP2832379 - Method for the treatment of biological tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik AG Ackerstrasse 6 8180 Bülach / CH | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rzany, Alexander Dombühler Strasse 30 90449 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Erdbrügger, Wilhelm St. Gebhard Strasse 34 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Galander, Marcus Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Galander, Marcus Biotronik SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13178696.4 | 31.07.2013 | [2015/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832379 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2832379 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
A61L27/3687 (EP,US);
A61L27/24 (US);
A61L27/367 (US);
A61L2430/20 (US);
A61L2430/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufbereitung von biologischem Gewebe | [2015/06] | English: | Method for the treatment of biological tissue | [2015/06] | French: | Procédé de préparation de tissus biologiques | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 30.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2013 | AL | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | RS | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | LU | 31.07.2015 | NO | 22.10.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 31.07.2013 | |
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 31.07.2013 | |
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
LU | 31.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.07.2013 | |
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0249681 (AUTO TISSUE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,3,4 *; | [AD]WO2004052417 (AUTO TISSUE GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9 * claims 1-4 * | by applicant | WO2004052417 | WO2011109433 | WO2005118014 |