EP2661124 - Signalling of Resource Status Information Between Base Stations for Load Balancing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahluwalia, Jagdeep Singh c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | [2014/42] |
Former [2013/45] | 01 /
Ahluwalia, Jagdeep Singh c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2015/15] |
Former [2013/45] | Smith, Jeremy, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13178830.9 | 03.02.2009 | [2013/45] | Priority number, date | GB20080002023 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: GB 0802023 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661124 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661124 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/22, H04W24/10, // H04W92/20 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H04W36/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0942 (KR);
H04W28/0958 (KR);
H04W72/52 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | H04W36/22, // H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | Signalisierung von Ressourcenstatusinformationen zwischen Basisstationen für Lastausgleich | [2013/45] | English: | Signalling of Resource Status Information Between Base Stations for Load Balancing | [2013/45] | French: | Signalisation d'informations de statut des ressources entre des stations de base pour l'équilibrage de charge | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09709160.7 / EP2253164 | EP11195063.0 / EP2453703 | EP13152085.0 / EP2584836 | Divisional application(s) | EP15151692.9 / EP2903345 | EP16189350.8 / EP3133868 | EP18186190.7 / EP3416424 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2009 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.02.2009 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.02.2009 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 08.04.2015 | |
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 08.04.2015 | |
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ORANGE, "On Traffic Load Reporting in LTE", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-060426, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060329), no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20060403, XP050159354 [A] 1-6 * chapter 2 "Measurement reporting modes" * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "[Draft] Reply LS on Load balancing", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-080601_CLEAN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080119), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sevilla, Spain; 20080119, XP050109099 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Inter-eNB Measurement Exchange for Handovers in E-UTRAN", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-061502, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20061004), no. Seoul, Korea; 20061010, XP050160388 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [XP] - NEC, "Details on Load Balancing and ICIC Signaling Mechanism", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-080389 DETAILS ON LOAD BALANCING AND ICIC SIGNALING MECHANISM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080205), no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080211, XP050163594 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * | [XP] - NEC, "Load Balancing Signalling and associated SON", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-081175, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080205), no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080211, XP050138949 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * | [XP] - NEC, "Details on Load Balancing and ICIC Signaling Mechanism", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-080388_DETAILS ON LOAD BALANCING AND ICIC SIGNALING MECHANISM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080205), no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080211, XP050163593 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * |