EP2832690 - Method for making an aerogel material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMPA Eidgenössische Materialprüfungs- und Forschungsanstalt Überlandstrasse 129 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Schmauder & Partner AG Patent- & Markenanwälte VSP Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13179185.7 | 02.08.2013 | [2015/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832690 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/145, C01B33/155, C01B33/158 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
C01B33/145 (EP,US);
E04B1/78 (US);
C01B33/155 (EP,US);
C01B33/1585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Aerogelmaterials | [2015/06] | English: | Method for making an aerogel material | [2015/06] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un matériau aérogel | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2013 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/27] | 22.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0585456 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* examples 1-10 *; | [A]US2005192366 (OU DUAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0060] * * examples 1-10 * * claims 12-17 *; | [A]FR2873677 (ARMINES ASS POUR LA RECH ET LE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 1 * * claims 1-8 *; | [XDI]WO2013053951 (ENERSENS [FR]) [XD] 14,15 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-11 * [I] 1-13; | [A] - SCHWERTFEGER F ET AL, "Hydrophobic waterglass based aerogels without solvent exchange or supercritical drying", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980415), vol. 225, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0022-3093(98)00102-1, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 24 - 29, XP004178503 [A] 1-15 * page 24, column l, paragraph 1 - page 26, column l, paragraph 2 * * figures 1, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(98)00102-1 | by applicant | WO9506617 | US5565142 | WO9805591 | WO2012044052 | WO2013053951 | - J. NON. CRYST. SOLIDS, (1995), vol. 186, pages 104 - 112 |