EP2810642 - Chitosan-modified ethosome structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Chin-Tung 1F., No.12, Ln. 33 Jian'an Street Xindian District New Taipei City 231 / TW | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Po-Liang No.21, Aly. 23, Ln. 294, Sec. 4, Chenggong Rd. Neihu Dist. Taipei City 114 / TW | 02 /
Lee, Chin-Tung 1F., No.12, Ln 33, Jian'an St., Xindian Dist. New Taipei City 231 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | 01 /
Lee, Chin-Tung 1F., No.12, Ln. 33, Jian'an St., Xindian Dist. 231 New Taipei City / TW | ||
02 /
Chen, Po-Liang No.21, Aly. 23, Ln. 294, Sec. 4, Chenggong Rd. Neihu Dist. 114 Taipei City / TW | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13179674.0 | 08.08.2013 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | TW20130210593 | 05.06.2013 Original published format: TW 102210593 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2810642 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K36/185, A61K36/28, A61K36/33, A61K9/00 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/1271 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
A61K36/33 (EP);
A61K36/8945 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/33, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/8945, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Chitosan-modifizierte Ethosomstruktur | [2014/50] | English: | Chitosan-modified ethosome structure | [2014/50] | French: | Structure éthosome modifiée par chitosan | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0249501 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0144]; claims 1,11,20,22 *; | [A]US2004057917 (WOLF PETER [AT], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0048] *; | [A]WO2008065451 (MALVERN COSMECEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * example 2 *; | [A]US2009196895 (GOLZ-BERNER KARIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0016] - [0020]; claim - *; | [A]WO2011044523 (ATHERONOVA OPERATIONS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0200] - [0201] * |