EP2667657 - Base station apparatus, terminal apparatus, and communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/48] | Radio terminal device, radio base station device, and channel signal forming method | ||
[2015/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakao, Seigo c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Nishio, Akihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Imamura, Daichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Aoyama, Takahisa c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/40] |
Former [2013/48] | 01 /
Nakao, Seigo c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Nishio, Akihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Imamura, Daichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
Aoyma, Takahisa c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/40] |
Former [2013/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13180191.2 | 30.10.2009 | [2013/48] | Priority number, date | JP20080281388 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008281388 | JP20090083043 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009083043 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2667657 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2667657 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2667657 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06, H04L5/00, // H04W72/04 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
H04L5/003 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (US);
H04L5/001 (US);
H04L5/0046 (US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | Basisstationsvorrichtung, Endgerät und Kommunikationsverfahren | [2015/20] | English: | Base station apparatus, terminal apparatus, and communication method | [2015/20] | French: | Appareil de station de base, appareil de terminal et procédé de communication | [2015/20] |
Former [2013/48] | Funkendgerät, Funkbasisstationsgerät und Kanalsignalerzeugungsverfahren | ||
Former [2013/48] | Radio terminal device, radio base station device, and channel signal forming method | ||
Former [2013/48] | Dispositif de terminal radio, dispositif de station de base radio et procédé de formation de signal de canal | Examination procedure | 13.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 21.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09823345.5 / EP2352330 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090823345) is 28.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | AT | 30.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | HR | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | MK | 30.09.2015 | MT | 30.09.2015 | NL | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | SM | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | IE | 30.10.2015 | LU | 30.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | NO | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | [2018/45] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 30.09.2015 | |
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 |