17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
13.10.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
09.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
04.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
02.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
03.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
03.06.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
03.06.2016 |
Change - French title |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
17.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
12.09.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
05.09.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |