EP2712921 - Hemangio colony forming cells and non-engrafting hemangio cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Institute for Regenerative Medicine 33 Locke Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Advanced Cell Technology, Inc. 381 Plantation Street Biotech V Worcester, MA 01605 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lanza, Robert 35 South Meadow Road Clinton, MA 01510 / US | 02 /
Lu, Shi-Jiang 22 Vega Drive Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2014/14] | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13180755.4 | 06.05.2009 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | US20080126802P | 06.05.2008 Original published format: US 126802 P | US20080190282P | 26.08.2008 Original published format: US 190282 P | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712921 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2712921 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/13, A61N5/10, A61K45/06, A61K35/44, A61K35/12, A61K35/28, C12N5/0789 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
C12N5/0647 (EP,US);
C12N5/069 (KR);
A61K35/12 (US);
A61K35/28 (US);
A61K35/44 (US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K2035/124 (US);
C12N2500/90 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/125 (EP,US);
C12N2501/14 (US);
C12N2501/145 (EP,US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2501/165 (EP,US);
C12N2501/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | C12N5/0789 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2014/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Koloniebildende Hemangiozellen und nichtimplantierende Hemangiozellen | [2014/14] | English: | Hemangio colony forming cells and non-engrafting hemangio cells | [2014/14] | French: | Cellules formant des colonies hémangioblastiques et cellules hémangioblastiques non transplantables | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09743610.9 / EP2291513 | Divisional application(s) | EP18182514.2 / EP3441462 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2009 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | MT | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | PT | 11.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.05.2009 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.05.2009 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004052771 (LIM SAI KIANG [SG]); | [X]WO2007095064 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al); | [X]WO2007120811 (ADVANCED CELL TECH INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO9505452 | US5399346 | US6410015 | US2003217374 | US2003232430 | US2004052771 | US2004091936 | WO2005118780 | WO2007120811 | WO2009137624 | US20050729173 | US20070787262 |