17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
10.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.10.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.10.2016 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
26.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
29.08.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
25.02.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |