blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2839753

EP2839753 - Method and device for thawing food, in particular fish, meat, poultry and fruits [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.01.2016
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.02.2016  [2016/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Verein zur Förderung des Technologietransfers an der Hochschule Bremerhaven e.V.
Fischkai 1
27572 Bremen / DE
[2015/09]
Inventor(s)01 / von Bargen, Markus
Carsten-Lücken-Str. 12b
27574 Bremerhaven / DE
02 / Ringer, Linda
Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Str. 71
27568 Bremerhaven / DE
03 / Lösche, Klaus
Johannisburger Str. 20
27580 Bremerhaven / DE
 [2015/09]
Representative(s)Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR
Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18
44141 Dortmund / DE
[2015/09]
Application number, filing date13181021.020.08.2013
[2015/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2839753
Date:25.02.2015
Language:DE
[2015/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:A23L3/365
[2015/09]
CPC:
A23B2/82 (EP); A21D17/006 (EP); A23B4/07 (EP);
A23B7/045 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auftauen von Lebensmitteln, insbesondere Fisch, Fleisch, Geflügel und Früchten[2015/09]
English:Method and device for thawing food, in particular fish, meat, poultry and fruits[2015/09]
French:Procédé et dispositif de décongélation de produits alimentaires, en particulier de poisson, de viande, de volaille et de fruits[2015/09]
Examination procedure20.08.2013Examination requested  [2015/09]
26.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/08]
06.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/08]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]GB1534845  (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE);
 [A]JPS61114015  (IZUMI MASAHIKO);
 [ID]US2008305222  (TAKENAKA SHINTARO [JP]);
 [XI]EP2614729  (COOLNOVA UG [DE])
by applicantUS4464401
 US4898741
 DE10051951
 US2003108655
 US2004066835
 US2008271730
 US2008305222
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.