Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9388106 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2016 | B2 | US2014080745 | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314027277 | 16.09.2013 | US201261701840 | 17.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103657515B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B | CN103657515 | 26.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261701840 | 17.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2708526 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | B1 | EP2708526 | 19.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261701840 | 17.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102013021899 | 27.01.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261701840 | 17.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2823476 | 17.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261701840 | 17.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX344734 | 05.01.2017 | B | MX2013010184 | 25.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261701840 | 17.09.2012 |