EP2700785 - Natural fracture injection test [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Holdings LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Road Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2023/40] |
Former [2023/33] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated Houston, 77210-4740 / US | ||
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P. O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Christopher RL 1210 Windiver Court Sugar Land, TX Texas 77479 / US | 02 /
Moos, Daniel 925 Clara Drive Palo Alto, CA California 94303 / US | 03 /
Barton, Colleen A. 351 Grove Drive Portola Vly, CA California 94028 / US | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/40] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [2014/09] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13181146.5 | 21.08.2013 | [2014/09] | Priority number, date | US201213591745 | 22.08.2012 Original published format: US201213591745 | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2700785 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2700785 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2700785 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/26, E21B47/06, E21B49/00 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
E21B43/26 (EP,US);
E21B47/06 (EP,US);
E21B49/008 (EP,US);
E21B49/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2014/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Natürlicher Frakturinjektionstest | [2014/09] | English: | Natural fracture injection test | [2014/09] | French: | Test d'injection de fracture naturelle | [2014/09] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2019 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 18.09.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 18.09.2019 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 11.10.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.08.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 23.09.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 13.09.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 25.10.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4192182 (SYLVESTER G CLAY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]US4793413 (SINGH PRAMOD K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03014524 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0048]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2010129677 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0036] , [0039] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0053] , [0057]; figure 3; claims 14,18-20 *; | [A] - C A BARTON ET AL, "Shear Stimulation of a Basement Fractured Reservoir - the Raoq Field, Yemen (TG20)", SECOND MIDDLE EAST TIGHT GAS RESERVOIRS WORKSHOP - EXPLORATION & DEVELOPMENT STRATEGIES, Manama, Bahrain, (20101212), doi:10.3997/2214-4609.20145658, XP055204059 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3997/2214-4609.20145658 | Examination | US2012150515 |