EP2700757 - System and method to position and retain a sensor in a faucet spout [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOHLER CO. 444 Highland Drive Kohler, WI 53044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states KOHLER CO. 444 Highland Avenue Kohler, WI 53044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esche, John C. 931 Aspen Road Kohler, WI Wisconsin 53044 / US | 02 /
Hansen, David E. 1217 Alcott Avenue Howards Grove, WI Wisconsin 53083 / US | 03 /
Hildebrand, Jeffrey C. 3004 Evergreen Pkwy Sheboygan, WI Wisconsin 53083 / US | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13181612.6 | 23.08.2013 | [2014/09] | Priority number, date | US201261692912P | 24.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261692912 P | US201261692959P | 24.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261692959 P | US201261692966P | 24.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261692966 P | US201313794638 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313794638 | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2700757 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2700757 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/05 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
E03C1/057 (EP,CN,US);
F16K31/002 (CN);
F16K27/00 (CN);
F16K27/041 (CN);
F16K31/02 (US);
F16K31/061 (CN);
F16K31/0675 (CN);
F16K37/0041 (US);
E03C2001/0415 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0318 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0324 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87917 (EP,US);
Y10T137/9464 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Positionieren und Halten eines Sensors in einem Wasserhahnauslauf | [2014/09] | English: | System and method to position and retain a sensor in a faucet spout | [2014/09] | French: | Système et procédé pour positionner et retenir un capteur dans un bec de robinet | [2014/09] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008094651 (MASCO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XA]US2007156260 (RODENBECK ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * [A] 15; | [XA]FR2761446 (CELEC CONCEPTION ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * [A] 15 |