EP2720193 - Method and system for detecting uneven road surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
You, Ganmei c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168 Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044, Beijing / CN | 02 /
Lu, Yaojie c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168 Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044, Beijing / CN | 03 /
Shi, Zhongchao c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168 Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044, Beijing / CN | 04 /
Wang, Gang c/o Ricoh Software Research Center (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor, No. 168 Xiwai Street Haidian District 100044, Beijing / CN | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13181638.1 | 26.08.2013 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | CN201210335758 | 11.09.2012 Original published format: CN201210335758 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2720193 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2720193 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G08G1/00, G06T7/20 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G06T7/70 (EP);
G06T2207/10021 (EP);
G06T2207/30252 (EP);
G06T2207/30256 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erkennung einer unebenen Straßenoberfläche | [2014/16] | English: | Method and system for detecting uneven road surface | [2014/16] | French: | Procédé et système pour détecter des irrégularités de la surface de la route | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 22.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.05.2020 | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 12.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 20.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - LABAYRADE R ET AL, "Real time obstacle detection in stereovision on non flat road geometry through V-disparity representation", INTELLIGENT VEHICLE SYMPOSIUM, 2002. IEEE JUN 17-21, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020617), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-7346-4, pages 646 - 651, XP010635896 [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [I] 3-8 | [XAI] - BASAM MUSLEH ET AL, "Visual ego motion estimation in urban environments based on U-V disparity", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM (IV), 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20120603), doi:10.1109/IVS.2012.6232183, ISBN 978-1-4673-2119-8, pages 444 - 449, XP032452974 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6-8 [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2012.6232183 | [XA] - DIDIER AUBERT ET AL, "Détection d'obstacles routiers par stéréovision : l'approche v-disparité ; Road obstacles detection by stereovision: The v-disparity approach", ANNALS OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS - ANNALES DES TÃ CR LÃ CR COMMUNICATIONS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, PARIS, (20050401), vol. 60, no. 3 - 4, doi:10.1007/BF03219823, ISSN 1958-9395, pages 299 - 325, XP019968360 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [A] 2-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF03219823 | [A] - ZHENCHENG HU ET AL, "A Complete U-V-Disparity Study for Stereovision Based 3D Driving Environment Analysis", 3-D DIGITAL IMAGING AND MODELING, 2005. 3DIM 2005. FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OTTAWA, ON, CANADA 13-16 JUNE 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050613), doi:10.1109/3DIM.2005.6, ISBN 978-0-7695-2327-9, pages 204 - 211, XP010810998 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3DIM.2005.6 | by applicant | US8108119 | - Z.HU, F. LAMOSA; K. UCHIMURA, "A Complete U-V-Disparity Study for Stereovision Based 3d Driving Environment Analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 3- D DIGITAL IMAGING AND MODELING (3DIM05, (2005), pages 204 - 211 | US20100782309 |