EP2702864 - Greenhouse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beheer 141 B.V. Vlotlaan 139 2681 TW Monster / NL | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwinkels, Sebastiaan Cornelis Hendricus p/a Vlotlaan 139 2681 TW Monster / NL | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2018/01] |
Former [2014/10] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13181994.8 | 28.08.2013 | [2014/10] | Priority number, date | NL20122009390 | 30.08.2012 Original published format: NL 2009390 | [2014/10] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2702864 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2702864 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/22 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
A01G9/222 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2014/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Gewächshaus | [2014/10] | English: | Greenhouse | [2014/10] | French: | Serre | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 01.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 03.01.2018 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | GB | 28.08.2018 | IE | 28.08.2018 | LU | 28.08.2018 | MT | 28.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AL | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.08.2018 | ||
IE | 28.08.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
MT | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AL | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.08.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
MT | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.08.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
MT | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.08.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
MT | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.08.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2501147 (EHAGE JALOUSIE FABRIK ERICH HI) [A] 10* figures 1,2,3,5 *; | [A]NL7811454 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV) [A] 10 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]GB2197007 (SANWA SHUTTER CORP) [A] 10 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]FR2665720 (MASSOT ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - line 32 *; | [A]EP0483994 (NICHIBEI KK [JP]) [A] 10 * figures 2-10 *; | [XY]EP0715054 (GIGOLA ANTONIO [IT]) [X] 10 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 16 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 35 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 35 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 55 * [Y] 1-9; | [A]CA2327648 (DE SILVA NICOLE ASANKA [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 16 *; | [Y]NL1028445C (LEK INSTALLATIETECHNIEK B V [NL]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 13 - line 25 * * page 2, line 29 - line 31 * * page 3, line 4 - line 12 * * page 4, line 17 - line 31 *; | [A] - NEEFJES H, "AFSCHERMEN VAN ASSIMILATIELICHT", VAKBLAD VOOR DE BLOEMISTERIJ, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, DEN HAAG, NL, (20010330), vol. 56, no. 13, ISSN 0042-2223, pages 34 - 37, XP001048359 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - GROEN J J, "Gevelschermen: plaatsing, systemen en doeken", VAKBLAD VOOR DE BLOEMISTERIJ,, (19870130), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 58 - 59, XP001252938 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | NL8902603 |